House | 03/12/2024 | Re-assigned to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez |