House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0803
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|