House | 07/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | To Business & Industry Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |