House
|
10/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|