House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0194
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|