House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0452
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 090-023-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 090-023-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-028-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|