Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|