House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Police Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts |