House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations- Public Safety and Infrastructure
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-001-002
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|