Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-020-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|