Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-047-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|