House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
To Foster Care Placement Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|