House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |