House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |