House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |