House
|
11/17/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0564
|
|
|
House
|
11/17/2023
|
Effective Date November 17, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/17/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 097-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Do Pass State Government; 006-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Postponed - State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Postponed - State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|