House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0541
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|