House | 04/09/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |