House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0456
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|