House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton |