House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0197
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|