House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|