House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|