House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Public Utilities Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | To Telecom Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |