House | 04/12/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |