House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0198
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|