House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0050
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Health and Human Services; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-036-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|