House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0199
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|