House
|
05/31/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Racial Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Racial Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|