Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|