House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0201
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Labor; 016-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|