House
|
08/15/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0544
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date August 11, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 072-030-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 072-030-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 043-010-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|