House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |