Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|