House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Kelly | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |