House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0358
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 073-036-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 045-011-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 008-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|