House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|