House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0359
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 041-014-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Labor; 011-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|