House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |