House
|
08/14/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0560
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|