House
|
06/07/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0008
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024; ; Some Provisions
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Effective Date July 1, 2023; ; Some Provisions
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Effective Date June 7, 2023; ; Some Provisions
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 073-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 073-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 036-020-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|