House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0361
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Behavioral and Mental Health; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Behavioral and Mental Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|