House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0362
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-034-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|