House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|