House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0459
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 042-011-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass State Government; 006-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Postponed - State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-031-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|