House
|
06/16/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0101
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Effective Date June 16, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 084-007-003
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|