Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB3915 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/17/2023

                            103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB3915 Introduced 2/17/2023, by Rep. Justin Slaughter SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  410 ILCS 705/40-5  Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides that entities awarded a cannabis transporting license may defer paying the associated license fee for a period of no more than one year. Provides that, from January 1, 2024 through January 1, 2029, the Department shall not issue any transporting licenses, except those transporting licenses issued before the effective date of the amendatory Act.  LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b   A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB3915 Introduced 2/17/2023, by Rep. Justin Slaughter SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  410 ILCS 705/40-5 410 ILCS 705/40-5  Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides that entities awarded a cannabis transporting license may defer paying the associated license fee for a period of no more than one year. Provides that, from January 1, 2024 through January 1, 2029, the Department shall not issue any transporting licenses, except those transporting licenses issued before the effective date of the amendatory Act.  LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b     LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b   A BILL FOR
103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB3915 Introduced 2/17/2023, by Rep. Justin Slaughter SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
410 ILCS 705/40-5 410 ILCS 705/40-5
410 ILCS 705/40-5
Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides that entities awarded a cannabis transporting license may defer paying the associated license fee for a period of no more than one year. Provides that, from January 1, 2024 through January 1, 2029, the Department shall not issue any transporting licenses, except those transporting licenses issued before the effective date of the amendatory Act.
LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b     LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b
    LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b
A BILL FOR
HB3915LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b   HB3915  LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b
  HB3915  LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b
1  AN ACT concerning health.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act is amended
5  by changing Section 40-5 as follows:
6  (410 ILCS 705/40-5)
7  Sec. 40-5. Issuance of licenses.
8  (a) The Department shall issue transporting licenses
9  through a process provided for in this Article no later than
10  July 1, 2020. Entities awarded a license under this Section
11  may defer paying the associated license fee for a period of no
12  more than one year.
13  (b) The Department shall make the application for
14  transporting organization licenses available on January 7,
15  2020 and shall receive such applications no later than March
16  15, 2020. The Department of Agriculture shall make available
17  such applications on every January 7 thereafter or if that
18  date falls on a weekend or holiday, the business day
19  immediately succeeding the weekend or holiday and shall
20  receive such applications no later than March 15 or the
21  succeeding business day thereafter.
22  (c) From January 1, 2024 through January 1, 2029, the
23  Department shall not issue any transporting licenses, except

 

103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB3915 Introduced 2/17/2023, by Rep. Justin Slaughter SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
410 ILCS 705/40-5 410 ILCS 705/40-5
410 ILCS 705/40-5
Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides that entities awarded a cannabis transporting license may defer paying the associated license fee for a period of no more than one year. Provides that, from January 1, 2024 through January 1, 2029, the Department shall not issue any transporting licenses, except those transporting licenses issued before the effective date of the amendatory Act.
LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b     LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b
    LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

410 ILCS 705/40-5



    LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b

 

 



 

  HB3915  LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b


HB3915- 2 -LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b   HB3915 - 2 - LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b
  HB3915 - 2 - LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b
1  those transporting licenses issued under subsection (a) before
2  the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 103rd General
3  Assembly.
4  (Source: P.A. 101-27, eff. 6-25-19; 101-593, eff. 12-4-19.)

 

 

  HB3915 - 2 - LRB103 27155 CPF 53524 b