House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |