House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
08/29/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|