House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Ethics & Elections
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|